U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-03473
  • Case Name: Wang v. Bondi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 28, 2025: [Electronic Filing Error]
  • April 27, 2025: [Certificate/Proof of Service]
  • April 26, 2025: [Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2025: [Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
  • April 19, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 19, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.