U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01555-7
  • Case Name: Rita Rabayeva
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Appearance / Special (Notice)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Errors/Deficiencies (BNC)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [BNC Court Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Change of Attorney Information Form (CSD 1546)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Failure to Comply with Filing Requirements (Notice)(24 hr)(CSD 1014)(BNC)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [CASB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Auto-docket of credit card]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-docket of credit card]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) - case upload]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Statement About Your Social Security Number (121) (secured image)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) - case upload]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Number (121) (secured image)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.