U.S. District Court for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-mj-00220-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Solis-Ralios
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [CVB Generic Text Only Entry]
  • May 06, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Bond and Conditions (CR-1) - Material Witness only]
  • May 06, 2025: [Declaration re Passport (CR-37)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Bond and Conditions (CR-1)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Declaration re Passport (CR-37)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Affidavit (CJA 23) - NFPV]
  • April 29, 2025: [Directing Defendant to Appear for Preliminary Hearing and PIA (M-60)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Advisement of Defendant's Statutory & Constitutional Rights (CR-10)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Local Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Report Commencing Criminal Action (CR-64)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit (CJA 23) - NFPV]
  • April 21, 2025: [Commitment (Place of Confinement) Material Witness]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Material Witness]
  • April 21, 2025: [Designate as Material Witness]
  • April 21, 2025: [Designate a Material Witness]
  • April 21, 2025: [Request for Detention]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.