U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-03464
  • Case Name: Santiago Santos Vanegas et al v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Request]
  • April 28, 2025: [Deficiency in Summons]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Request]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Lodging]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reassign Case (CV-81)]
  • April 22, 2025: [For Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.