U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-03502
  • Case Name: J.C. et al v. Noem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate/Proof of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Re-notice motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Clerk's Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Create Case Relationship]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Relating Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases]
  • April 23, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Electronic Filing Error]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
  • April 22, 2025: [Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.