U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01967-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Echeverria
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Information]
  • May 07, 2025: [Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Detention Hearing Continued (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing Continued]
  • April 28, 2025: [Pretrial Services - Bail Review Packet]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Change of Hearing (No PDF)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~ .Spanish]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.