U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01932-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Stip of Fact and Joint Mot for Release of Material Witness(es)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Information]
  • May 01, 2025: [Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (No PDF)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - Material Witness]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - Material Witness]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment of Material Witness (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (Pretrial Release Order)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial Services - Bail Review Packet]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Assertion of Rights]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [~ .Spanish]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings (w/ MW Atty Appt)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.