U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01940-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasquez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Information]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (No PDF)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • May 02, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing Continued]
  • May 02, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Change of Hearing (No PDF)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~ .Spanish]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.