U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01939-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Suarez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Merged Case]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Services - Bail Review Packet]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Information]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~ .English]
  • April 21, 2025: [Abstract of Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings (w/ MW Atty Appt)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice to Appear]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.