U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01889-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cortez Meza
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Information]
  • May 02, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing Continued]
  • May 02, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Pretrial Services - Bail Review Packet]
  • April 25, 2025: [Abstract of Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Bond - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Assertion of Rights]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (Pretrial Release Order)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2025: [~ .English]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.