U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01731-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 07, 2025: [Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Pretrial Services - Bail Review Packet]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 24, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing Continued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2025: [~ .English]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Case Unsealed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Assertion of Rights]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.