U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01901-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roston
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Pretrial Services - Bail Review Packet]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Assertion of Rights]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (Pretrial Release Order)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Clear PROV Flag]
  • April 24, 2025: [~ .English]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2025: [~~Util - Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Excludable Start/Stop]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Provisional Attorney Appointment]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.