U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Juan Carlos Marquez v. Ford Motor Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief (non-motion non-appeal)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
  • April 23, 2025: [Brief (non-motion non-appeal)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 22, 2025: [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.