U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01970-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alvarez Parra
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Information]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Plea Agreement]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Change of Hearing (No PDF)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Assertion of Rights]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 23, 2025: [~ .Spanish]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.