U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01968-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodgers
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing Continued]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Clear PROV Flag]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Change of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (Pretrial Release Order)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 28, 2025: [~ .English]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Excludable Start/Stop]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Provisional Attorney Appointment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~~Util - Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.