U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-03528
  • Case Name: Student Does #4 et al v. Kristi Noem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply (Motion related)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form]
  • April 21, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties]
  • April 21, 2025: [Related Case(s)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.