U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-xr-90768-1
  • Case Name: People of the State of California v. Butler
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Vacate ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.