U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-03534
  • Case Name: Eli Lilly and Company v. MOCHI HEALTH CORP. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Electronic Filing Error]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 23, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.