U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-03502
  • Case Name: Vihan Jagasia et al v. Kristi Noem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Related Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply (Motion related)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Request]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2025: [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Request]
  • April 23, 2025: [Deficiency in Summons]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.