U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-03571
  • Case Name: Montgomery et al v. U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for MLM1 Trust Series 2006-HE4, Bank of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Request for Judicial Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2025: [Certificate/Proof of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Electronic Filing Error]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.