U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-08320-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cortez-Mendoza
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Withdrawal of Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Information]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [~ Mixteco de Guerrero]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.