U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-01998-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carrera-Serrano
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 29, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Assertion of Rights]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [~ .Spanish]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Services - Bail Review Packet]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.