U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-02003-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Osorio et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (Pretrial Release Order)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Merged Case]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Plea Agreement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 29, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing Continued]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Information]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - Material Witness]
  • April 28, 2025: [Arraignment of Material Witness (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (Pretrial Release Order)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stipulation of Fact and Joint Motion for Release of Material Witness]
  • April 24, 2025: [Bond - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [~ .English]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Services - Bail Review Packet]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings (w/ MW Atty Appt)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Appear]
  • April 23, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.