U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-02021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ho
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Pretrial Services - Bail Review Packet]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - Material Witness]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment of Material Witness (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (Pretrial Release Order)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Clear PROV Flag]
  • April 29, 2025: [~ .English]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Status Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 25, 2025: [~~Util - Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Excludable Start/Stop]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Provisional Attorney Appointment]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings (w/ MW Atty Appt)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.