U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-02030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rangel-Aldama
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - Material Witness]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arraignment of Material Witness (w/ Schedules)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Bond - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [~~Util - Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Abstract of Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Pretrial Services - Bail Review Packet]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (Pretrial Release Order)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [~ .Spanish]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Assertion of Rights]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Duty Hearings (w/ MW Atty Appt)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.