U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-03626
  • Case Name: Morgan v. American Airlines Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 28, 2025: [Electronic Filing Error]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
  • April 24, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.