U.S. Federal Court Records for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-12760-MH
  • Case Name: Ciclali Manjarrez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Paid Installment Payment (2 - Second Installment)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Paid Installment Payment (1 - First Installment)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [OSC re dism for failure to comply rule 1006(B) -installments (BNC)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Zero Installment Payment]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Optional BNC)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [In forma pauperis (Optional BNC)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (I/J No POC) (309A) (AutoAssign)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (motion)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Db Received Income From an Employer (LBR Form F1002-1)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [In forma pauperis (motion)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Per Part 5 of Voluntary Petition)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bui, (TR) Lynda T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.