U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-02054
  • Case Name: The Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento v. John S-4 Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments]
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint]
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Payment Due (Certificate)]
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [EFILED RECEIPT - Adversary Fee Paid [ADI]]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Add Party via Internet Site]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Entry]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Payment Due (A/R) - Including Amended]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Shorten Time (Order)]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Shorten Time - Including Amended Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Exhibit(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Declaration]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion/Application - Including Amended Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Filing Fee Due]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order to Confer]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BDRP]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint (Intake)]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Adversary Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.