U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-22067
  • Case Name: Kelly Michelle Lundgren
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [341 Meeting - Chapter 7 Only (Duplicate) (Certificate)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [341 Meeting - Chapter 7 Only (Duplicate) (Certificate)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [BNC Service of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [341 Meeting - Chapter 7 Only (Duplicate)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [341 Meeting - Chapter 7 Only (Duplicate)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [Change of Name and/or Address]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [Master Address List]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [Incomplete Filing and NOI to Dismiss Case - Chapter 7]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [DO NOT USE Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [First Meeting - 7]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (7) [ADI]]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bakken, Loris L [Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.