U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40736
  • Case Name: Sharon Arlece Montgomery
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [Order Re Ch 13 Plan and Adequate Protection Payments]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [File Missing Documents]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [none]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bronitsky, Martha G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.