U.S. Federal Court Records for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-13657
  • Case Name: Yurietta Luviano and Hugo Ruben Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Declaration RE Filing of Tax Returns and Payment of Domestic Supp. Obligations (Preconfirmation)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Debtor's notice of 341(a) mtg - Chapter 13]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Rights and Resp Agreement]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR F1007-1)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income (Official Form 122C-2)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Official Form 122C-1)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Schedule J: Your Expenses (Official Form 106J)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Schedule I: Your Income (Official Form 106I)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Schedule C: The Property You Claimed as Exempt (Official Form 106C)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Proof of service]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Notice of Hearing (BK Case)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) ]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Meeting of Creditors 13 (309I) (AutoAssign)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Per Part 5 of Voluntary Petition)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Db Received Income From an Employer (LBR Form F1002-1)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Per Part 5 of Voluntary Petition)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Db Received Income From an Employer (LBR Form F1002-1)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dockery, (TR) Kathy A [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.