U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-90338
  • Case Name: Kenneth Lee Blasengym and Angelina Nichole Blasengym
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [BNC Service of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Certificate)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [Requirement to File a Statement of Completion - Financial Management (Certificate)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [341 Meeting - Chapter 7 Only]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [Personal Financial Management Course]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [Disclosure of Attorney Compensation - Including Amendments]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [Incomplete Filing and NOI to Dismiss Case - Chapter 7]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (7) [ADI]]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [DO NOT USE Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [First Meeting - 7]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [Master Address List]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fear, Peter L. [Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.