U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30347
  • Case Name: Anthony Crisostomo Ramos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Little, Sarah L. [Extend Time]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Little, Sarah L. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Little, Sarah L. [Extend Time]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Little, Sarah L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Little, Sarah L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Little, Sarah L. [Generate 341 Notices]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Little, Sarah L. [File Missing Documents]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Little, Sarah L. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Little, Sarah L. [none]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Little, Sarah L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Little, Sarah L. [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.