U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-22159
  • Case Name: Robin Nicole Adair and Richard Henry Adair
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Notice of Payment Due (Certificate)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Personal Financial Management Course]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Certificate)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Requirement to File a Statement of Completion - Financial Management (Certificate)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Notice of Payment Due (A/R) - Including Amended]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Notice of Entry (Certificate)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [341 Meeting - Chapter 7 Only]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Notice of Entry (BNC) (Do Not Use for L70)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [In forma pauperis (Chapter 7 Petitions ONLY) (Order)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [In forma pauperis (Chaper 7 Petitions ONLY) - Including Amended Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Order for Judge's Signature (In forma pauperis) - Waive Fee]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [DO NOT USE Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Master Address List]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [First Meeting - 7]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Vetter, Jeffrey M. [Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.