U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10272
  • Case Name: James Emerson Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burchard, David [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burchard, David [Request for Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burchard, David [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burchard, David [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burchard, David [Order Re Ch 13 Plan and Adequate Protection Payments]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burchard, David [File Missing Documents]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burchard, David [none]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burchard, David [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burchard, David [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burchard, David [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.