U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-22255
  • Case Name: Ignatius Lee Taylor, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [Notice of Entry (Certificate)]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [BNC Service of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case (Certificate)]
  • May 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Certificate)]
  • May 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [Requirement to File a Statement of Completion - Financial Management (Certificate)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [Notice of Entry (BNC) (Do Not Use for L70)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [In forma pauperis (Chapter 7 Petitions ONLY) (Order)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [BNC Service of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [341 Meeting - Chapter 7 Only]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [Incomplete Filing & NOI to Dismiss Case - NEW Paper Petitions only]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [Incomplete Filing & NOI to Dismiss Case - AMENDED ALL CHAPTERS]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [Order for Judge's Signature (In forma pauperis) - Waive Fee]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [Master Address List]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [In forma pauperis (Chaper 7 Petitions ONLY) - Including Amended Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [DO NOT USE Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [First Meeting - 7]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edmonds, Irma [Voluntary Petition - 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.