Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:14-15864-
    Party Name:Sandra Will Carradine
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Compensation (Trustee)]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Chapter 7 Trustee's Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Claimant's Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:August 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Non-Discharge]
    Date Published:June 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Notice of Non Discharge]
    Date Published:June 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:May 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Sell]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Status Report]
    Date Published:May 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:April 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Stipulation (Motion to Approve) with Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Stipulation (Motion to Approve) and Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Employ & Sell]
    Date Published:February 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Compensation (Professional)]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Extend Time]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Compensation (Application by/for Professional - Chapter 7, 11 or 12)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Administrative Expenses]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Set Administrative Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Set Administrative Bar Date For Filing Proofs of Claim]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [File]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Report of Sale]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Notice (Informational)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Other Order]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Abandon]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Joinder]
    Date Published:September 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Reply to Response to Motion to Withdraw the Reference]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Reconsider]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [XOther Motion]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Certificate of Contested Matter]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Stay]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Set Hearing]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Shorten Time]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Approve]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Support Document]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Virtual Order: Turnover]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Removal of Professional Or Trustee]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Turnover (Motion For) and Notice (Chapter 7 Trustees Only)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Schedule C]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Turnover (Motion)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Notice of Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Document]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Appear Telephonically]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Strike]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Notice]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Set Hearing (Bankruptcy)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Extend Time (Bankruptcy)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Turnover (Motion For)]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Chapter 7 Reminder Notice of Financial Management Certificate]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Change of Address]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Attorney Change of Address (Batch - Training)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Objection]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Certificate of Non-Contested Matter]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Enforce]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Withdraw As Attorney]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [9013-1.1 Notice]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Notification Entry (Public Entry)]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Witness List and Exhibits]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Response]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Notice Request]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [4001-1.1 Notice]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
    Date Published:May 26, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?415842
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =