U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:03-mj-01274-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kolotov
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 20, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 14, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.