U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-po-07003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gardner
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 24, 2016: [Continue]
  • March 22, 2016: [Exclude]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.