U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-mj-01087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 06, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • May 13, 2016: [APPEAL of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court-mj cases]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint CJA Counsel]
  • May 09, 2016: [Appoint CJA Counsel]
  • May 07, 2016: [Leave to Restrict]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.