U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00104
  • Case Name: Willenborg v. Newcastle Home Loans, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Appear]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 11, 2016: [Expedite]
  • May 11, 2016: [Memorandum]
  • May 10, 2016: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.