U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mj-07009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimenez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Stay]
  • November 29, 2016: [Stay]
  • November 28, 2016: [APPEAL of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court-mj cases]
September, 2016
  • September 05, 2016: [Preclude]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 30, 2016: [List of Witnesses]
  • August 30, 2016: [In Limine]
  • August 25, 2016: [Exclude]
  • August 24, 2016: [In Limine]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 07, 2016: [Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 07, 2016: [CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.