U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00136
  • Case Name: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Sexton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Contempt Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • October 06, 2016: [Show Cause]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 01, 2016: [Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • June 30, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2016: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.