U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00137
  • Case Name: Green Solution Retail, Inc., The et al v. USA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Ruling]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Ruling]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Minute Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 09, 2016: [Extension of Time]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • September 15, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • September 15, 2016: [Enforce]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.