U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00162
  • Case Name: Speidell v. USA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Ruling]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • September 23, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 10, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.