U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00055
  • Case Name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Centura Health
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 22, 2018: [Stay]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 03, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Enforce]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • February 03, 2017: [Memorandum]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 02, 2017: [Appear]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 28, 2016: [Vacate]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Minute Order]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • September 02, 2016: [Leave]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 12, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify]
  • August 04, 2016: [Amend/Correct/Modify]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.