U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00167
  • Case Name: Green Solution, LLC et al v. IVXX Infuzionz, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Ruling]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 09, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Ruling]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Minute Order]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Enforce]
  • October 07, 2016: [Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.