U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-po-07008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bresselsmith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on FPD Motion for Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis- FPD]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on FPD Motion for Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis- FPD]
  • September 13, 2016: [Dismiss Counts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.