U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-po-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gamble
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 10, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
  • October 28, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 28, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 15, 2016: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.