U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00188
  • Case Name: Nutritional Elements Inc. et al v. USA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Minute Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 05, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 05, 2016: [Enforce]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.